Firstmerit Bank, National Association

Ohio – Summit – Akron

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

13675

1890

FDIC Certificate Number: 13675
FDIC's unique number: 8549
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 67311
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14579

Number of Domestic Offices: 214
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-05-17

1890-10-09 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Akron.
1984-12-31 Acquired The Twinsburg Banking Company in Twinsburg, Ohio.
1984-12-31 Acquired The Exchange Bank Company in Canal Fulton, Ohio.
1985-07-03 Changed name to First National Bank Of Ohio .
1994-04-22 Acquired Great Northern Savings Company in Barberton, Ohio.
1997-09-01 Changed name to Firstmerit Bank, National Association .
1997-10-14 Acquired The Old Phoenix National Bank Of Medina in Medina, Ohio.
1997-10-14 Acquired Est National Bank in Elyria, Ohio.
1998-03-23 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Canton, Ohio.
1998-03-23 Acquired Peoples Bank, National Association in Ashtabula, Ohio.
1998-03-23 Acquired Peoples National Bank in Wooster, Ohio.
1998-05-22 Acquired Premierbank & Trust in Elyria, Ohio.
1998-05-22 Acquired Jefferson Savings Bank in West Jefferson, Ohio.
1998-10-23 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland in Mayfield Heights, Ohio.
1998-10-23 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Kent in Kent, Ohio.
1999-02-12 Acquired Nc Interim National Bank in New Castle, Pennsylvania.
1999-02-12 Acquired Signal Bank, National Association in Wooster, Ohio.
1999-02-12 Acquired Summit Bank, National Association in Fairlawn, Ohio.
2010-02-19 Acquired George Washington Savings Bank in Orland Park, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-14 Acquired Midwest Bank And Trust Company in Elmwood Park, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $14,328,404,000
Total deposits: $11,412,576,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $11,412,576,000
Equity capital: $1,358,025,000

Net income: $59,774,000

Return on Assets: 0.84
Return on Equity: 8.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Firstmerit Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Firstmerit Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Firstmerit Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Firstmerit Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-330

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.