Glandorf Savings and Loan Association

Ohio – Putnam – Glandorf

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29760

1887

FDIC Certificate Number: 29760
FDIC's unique number: 42594
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 476771
Report Date: 1982-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1887-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Glandorf Savings And Loan Association.
1982-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of State Home Savings Association in Bowling Green, Ohio.
1985-01-31 Acquired Ohio Savings And Loan Association in Fostoria, Ohio.
1990-03-09 Changed name to State Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. .
1990-03-09 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1994-09-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society National Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
1996-06-17 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1996-06-17 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bryan, Ohio.
1997-06-23 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Naples, Florida.
1997-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Glandorf Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Glandorf Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Glandorf Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-100

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.