Guaranty Bank

Oregon – Clackamas – Canby

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19973

1969

FDIC Certificate Number: 19973
FDIC's unique number: 13715
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Portland

Federal Reserve ID Number: 93767
Report Date: 1976-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1969-06-30 Institution established. Original name: Guaranty Bank.
1976-09-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Oregon in Woodburn, Oregon.
1985-05-31 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1985-08-19 Changed name to Key Bank Of Oregon .
1986-07-01 Acquired Beaver State Bank in Beaverton, Oregon.
1986-11-08 Acquired Pacific Western Bank in Portland, Oregon.
1986-11-08 Acquired The First National Bank Of Mcminnville in Mcminnville, Oregon.
1986-11-08 Acquired Citizens Valley Bank in Albany, Oregon.
1986-11-08 Acquired Hood River County Bank in Hood River, Oregon.
1987-12-11 Acquired Lewis And Clark State Bank in Lake Oswego, Oregon.
1988-01-01 Acquired Western Security Bank in Salem, Oregon.
1993-12-31 Acquired Jackson County Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Medford, Oregon.
1994-04-15 Acquired Far West Federal Savings Bank in Portland, Oregon as part of a government assisted transaction.
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $7,638,000
Total deposits: $7,033,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Guaranty Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Guaranty Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Guaranty Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-210

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.