Hancock County Bank & Trust

Iowa – Hancock – Garner

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

13984

1934

FDIC Certificate Number: 13984
FDIC's unique number: 8746
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Des Moines

Federal Reserve ID Number: 565040
Report Date: 2003-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-05-16

1934-03-01 Institution established. Original name: Hancock County National Bank Of Garner.
1994-06-30 Changed name to Hancock County Bank & Trust .
1994-06-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1994-10-19 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2003-05-02 Reorganized.
2003-05-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Liberty Bank, F.S.B. in Arnolds Park, Iowa.
2003-05-27 Moved bank headquarters from Garner, Iowa to West Des Moines, Iowa.
2004-03-11 Acquired State Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Des Moines in Clive, Iowa.
2007-12-03 Acquired First Bank And Trust in Spirit Lake, Iowa.
2010-02-01 Acquired Liberty Bank in Naples, Florida.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $123,279,000
Total deposits: $94,575,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Hancock County Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Hancock County Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Hancock County Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-318

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.