Heritage Federal Savings Association

Colorado – Prowers – Lamar

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

33035

1990

FDIC Certificate Number: 33035
FDIC's unique number: 46265
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 23577
Report Date: 1991-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-25

1990-04-20 Institution established. Original name: Heritage Federal Savings Association.
1990-04-20 Acquired Heritage Savings And Loan Association in Lamar, Colorado.
1991-08-23 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Lamar in Lamar, Colorado.
2011-01-01 Changed name to Frontier Bank .
2011-01-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2011-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.

Total assets: $30,531,000
Total deposits: $31,300,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Heritage Federal Savings Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Heritage Federal Savings Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Heritage Federal Savings Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-370

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.