Home Banking Company

Tennessee – McNairy – Selmer

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

9196

1915

FDIC Certificate Number: 9196
FDIC's unique number: 5890
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 138556
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-07-15

1915-03-15 Institution established. Original name: Home Banking Company.
1991-03-07 Moved bank headquarters from Finger, Tennessee to Selmer, Tennessee.
2008-07-07 Acquired Community Bank in Meridian, Mississippi.

Total assets: $71,354,000
Total deposits: $63,412,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $63,412,000
Equity capital: $7,172,000

Net income: $313,000

Return on Assets: 0.91
Return on Equity: 9.07
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Home Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Home Banking Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Home Banking Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Home Banking Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-384

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.