Independent Bank

Virginia – Manassas Park (city) – Manassas

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22678

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22678
FDIC's unique number: 15830
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 883324
Report Date: 1994-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-02-02

1978-07-06 Institution established. Original name: Independent Bank Of Manassas.
1984-04-06 Changed name to Independent Bank .
1995-01-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Crestar Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1995-03-24 Acquired Tidemark Bank in Newport News, Virginia.
1996-11-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Crestar Bank in Vienna, Virginia.
1997-03-14 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Maryland in Laurel, Maryland.
1997-03-14 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Washington, National Association in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-11-14 Acquired American National Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Baltimore, Maryland.
2000-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SunTrust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2000-08-18 Moved bank headquarters from Richmond, Virginia to Atlanta, Georgia.
2003-06-02 Acquired Lighthouse Community Bank in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2005-04-22 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Nbc Bank, Fsb in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Suntrust Bankcard, National Association in Orlando, Florida.
2008-07-25 Acquired Gainesville Bank & Trust in Gainesville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Hiram, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of The South in Milledgeville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired United Bank & Trust Company in Rockmart, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Home Town Bank Of Villa Rica in Villa Rica, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Gwinnett in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Mountain State Bank in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2008-08-01 Acquired First Priority Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $84,475,000
Total deposits: $78,201,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Independent Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Independent Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Independent Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-138

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.