Key Bank of Wyoming - 611 Ninth Street, Wheatland, Wyoming 82201

Wyoming – Platte – Wheatland

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

1171

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 1171
FDIC's unique number: 803
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings

Federal Reserve ID Number: 30454
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1910-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Stock Growers' Bank Of Wheatland.
1976-12-31 Changed name to First Wyoming Bank - Wheatland .
1986-04-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Chugwater in Chugwater, Wyoming.
1988-12-30 Changed name to Key Bank Of Wyoming - 611 Ninth Street, Wheatland, Wyoming 82201 .
1989-10-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Wyoming - Corner - Midwest and Wolcott, Casper, Wyoming 8260 in Casper, Wyoming.
1990-08-17 Acquired Provident Savings Association, F.A. in Casper, Wyoming.
1991-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Wyoming in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-07-14 Changed name to Community First National Bank .
2000-08-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community First National Bank in Fargo, North Dakota.
2001-03-22 Acquired Community First State Bank in Vermillion, South Dakota.
2004-12-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the West in San Francisco, California.
2005-02-08 Acquired Union Safe Deposit Bank in Stockton, California.
2005-12-03 Acquired Commercial Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Omaha, Nebraska.

Total assets: $25,635,000
Total deposits: $22,988,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Key Bank of Wyoming - 611 Ninth Street, Wheatland, Wyoming 82201 does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Key Bank of Wyoming - 611 Ninth Street, Wheatland, Wyoming 82201, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Key Bank of Wyoming - 611 Ninth Street, Wheatland, Wyoming 82201 will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-107

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.