Landmark Bank of Ladue

Missouri – St. Louis – Saint Louis

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

15706

1921

FDIC Certificate Number: 15706
FDIC's unique number: 9972
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 576457
Report Date: 1984-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1921-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Pine Lawn Bank And Trust Company.
1975-07-07 Moved bank headquarters from Pine Lawn, Missouri to Ladue, Missouri.
1975-07-07 Changed name to Ladue-innerbelt Bank And Trust Company .
1979-03-09 Changed name to Ladue Bank & Trust Company .
1980-01-02 Changed name to Landmark Bank Of Ladue .
1984-11-13 Moved bank headquarters from Ladue, Missouri to Clayton, Missouri.
1985-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Landmark Bank in Clayton, Missouri.
1986-04-04 Acquired Landmark St. Louis Bank, National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
1986-12-01 Acquired The Brentwood Bank, Brentwood, Missouri in Brentwood, Missouri.
1991-12-20 Changed name to Magna Bank Of St. Louis, Clayton, Missouri .
1992-05-07 Acquired First Exchange Bank Of St. Louis in Saint Louis, Missouri.
1993-06-30 Changed name to Magna Bank Of Missouri .
1993-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Clayton, Missouri to Brentwood, Missouri.
1993-06-30 Acquired Magna Bank Of St. Charles County, St. Charles, Mo. in St. Charles, Missouri.
1994-02-18 Acquired Mega Bank in St. Ann, Missouri.
1994-06-30 Acquired Bank Of Chesterfield in Chesterfield, Missouri.
1995-11-17 Changed name to Magna Bank, National Association .
1995-11-17 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1995-11-17 Acquired Magna Bank Of Illinois, National Association in Brentwood, Missouri.
1996-02-29 Acquired Isbt, National Association in East Alton, Illinois.
1997-07-18 Acquired Magna Bank, National Association in Waterloo, Iowa.
1997-07-18 Acquired Magna Bank, Fsb in Waterloo, Iowa.
1998-10-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
1998-12-31 Acquired Ready State Bank in Hialeah, Florida.
1999-02-01 Acquired Merchants Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-02-19 Acquired Bank Of Laplace Of St. John The Baptist Parish, Louisiana in Laplace, Louisiana.
1999-03-19 Acquired Charter Bank, S.B. in Sparta, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Illinois, National Association in Robinson, Illinois.
1999-05-07 Acquired Ambank Indiana, National Association in Vincennes, Indiana.
1999-05-21 Acquired The First National Bank Of Wetumpka in Wetumpka, Alabama.
1999-05-21 Acquired First Mutual Bank, S.B. in Decatur, Illinois.
1999-06-11 Acquired Bank Of Cumberland in Burkesville, Kentucky.
1999-06-25 Acquired First And Farmers Bank Of Somerset, Inc. in Somerset, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired The First National Bank And Trust Company Of Corbin in Corbin, Kentucky.
1999-07-09 Acquired First Bank Of East Tennessee, National Association in La Follette, Tennessee.
1999-07-16 Acquired Alvin State Bank in Alvin, Texas.
1999-07-16 Acquired Republic National Bank Of Miami in Miami, Florida.
1999-08-13 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Kentucky, National Association in Paducah, Kentucky.
2000-02-12 Acquired First State Bank Of Covington, Tennessee in Covington, Tennessee.
2002-06-21 Acquired Jefferson Heritage Bank in Denton, Texas.
2003-06-09 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Tennessee Fsb in Paris, Tennessee.
2004-12-11 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Lakeway Area in Morristown, Tennessee.
2005-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $82,913,000
Total deposits: $72,924,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Landmark Bank of Ladue does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Landmark Bank of Ladue, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Landmark Bank of Ladue will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-222

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.