Legacy Bank

Oklahoma – Caddo – Hinton

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

17359

1954

FDIC Certificate Number: 17359
FDIC's unique number: 11368
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Oklahoma City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 874256
Report Date: 2000-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2000-05-25

1954-09-20 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1987-08-13 Acquired First State Bank in Blanchard, Oklahoma.
1994-11-01 Changed name to Legacy Bank .
1998-10-27 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2000-04-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Legacy Bank in Hinton, Oklahoma.
2003-03-28 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2003-03-28 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2005-11-14 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.

Total assets: $66,652,000
Total deposits: $60,597,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Legacy Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Legacy Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Legacy Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-344

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.