Liberty National Bank of Lexington

Kentucky – Fayette – Lexington

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

19586

1966

FDIC Certificate Number: 19586
FDIC's unique number: 13385
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington

Federal Reserve ID Number: 214816
Report Date: 1993-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18786
The date of the last data update: 1993-10-13

1966-05-16 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Lexington, Inc.
1982-04-28 Changed name to Bank Of Lexington .
1982-08-11 Changed name to Bank Of Lexington & Trust Company, Inc. .
1991-09-14 Acquired Liberty National Bank Of Jessamine in Nicholasville, Kentucky.
1991-09-14 Changed name to Liberty National Bank Of Lexington .
1993-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Liberty National Bank and Trust Company of Kentucky in Louisville, Kentucky.
1995-09-11 Changed name to Bank One, Kentucky, National Association .
1995-09-11 Acquired Liberty National Bank Of Shelbyville in Shelbyville, Kentucky.
1995-09-11 Acquired Liberty National Bank Of Owensboro in Owensboro, Kentucky.
1995-09-11 Acquired Liberty National Bank And Trust Company Of Central Kentucky in Elizabethtown, Kentucky.
1996-03-11 Acquired Bank One, Southern Indiana, National Association in New Albany, Indiana.
1996-03-11 Acquired Bank One, Western Kentucky, National Association in Hopkinsville, Kentucky.
1996-09-14 Acquired Bank One, Lexington, National Association in Lexington, Kentucky.
2003-05-15 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $265,433,000
Total deposits: $234,134,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Liberty National Bank of Lexington does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Liberty National Bank of Lexington, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Liberty National Bank of Lexington will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-355

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.