Londonderry Bank and Trust Company

New Hampshire – Rockingham – Londonderry

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20865

1972

FDIC Certificate Number: 20865
FDIC's unique number: 14414
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord

Federal Reserve ID Number: 504209
Report Date: 1983-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1972-11-20 Institution established. Original name: Londonderry Bank And Trust Company.
1983-07-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Bedford Bank in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1989-04-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank, National Association in Manchester, New Hampshire.
1990-02-28 Acquired First Cheshire Bank in Keene, New Hampshire.
1992-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First NH Bank in Concord, New Hampshire.
1995-03-30 Acquired Southeast Bank For Savings in Dover, New Hampshire.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Citizens Bank New Hampshire .
1996-09-01 Acquired First New Hampshire Investment Services in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2007-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of RBS Citizens, National Association in Providence, Rhode Island.

Total assets: $14,599,000
Total deposits: $13,073,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Londonderry Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Londonderry Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Londonderry Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-364

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.