Manufacturers Bank of Southfield, N.A.

Michigan – Oakland – Southfield

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

18893

1963

FDIC Certificate Number: 18893
FDIC's unique number: 12744
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Detroit

Federal Reserve ID Number: 837242
Report Date: 1987-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15167
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1963-09-19 Institution established. Original name: National Bank Of Southfield.
1978-04-24 Changed name to Manufacturers Bank Of Southfield, N.A. .
1987-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Manufacturers National Bank of Detroit in Detroit, Michigan.
1991-10-28 Changed name to Manufacturers Bank, National Association .
1991-10-28 Acquired Manufacturers National Bank Of Grand Rapids in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
1991-10-28 Acquired Manufacturers Bank Of Lansing in Lansing, Michigan.
1992-09-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank in Detroit, Michigan.
1998-12-12 Acquired Comerica Bank & Trust, Federal Savings Bank in Boca Raton, Florida.
2003-06-30 Acquired Comerica Bank - Texas in Dallas, Texas.
2003-06-30 Acquired Comerica Bank-california in San Jose, California.
2007-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from Detroit, Michigan to Dallas, Texas.
2007-11-01 Reorganized.
2011-07-28 Acquired Sterling Bank in Houston, Texas.

Total assets: $209,452,000
Total deposits: $186,967,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Manufacturers Bank of Southfield, N.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Manufacturers Bank of Southfield, N.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Manufacturers Bank of Southfield, N.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-286

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.