Marine Bank

Illinois – Sangamon – Springfield

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

20250

1970

FDIC Certificate Number: 20250
FDIC's unique number: 13929
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Il

Federal Reserve ID Number: 258445
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 9
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-02-04

1970-09-04 Institution established. Original name: Peoples National Bank Of Springfield.
1987-05-06 Reorganized.
1988-03-01 Changed name to Peoples Bank Of Springfield .
1993-11-01 Changed name to Marine Bank, Springfield .
1994-10-28 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1996-06-11 Changed trust powers from Limited Trust Powers Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2010-01-28 Changed name to Marine Bank .

Total assets: $576,462,000
Total deposits: $485,338,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $485,338,000
Equity capital: $52,484,000

Net income: $3,092,000

Return on Assets: 1.06
Return on Equity: 11.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Marine Bancorp, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Marine Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Marine Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Marine Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-87

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.