Massachusetts Co-operative Bank

Massachusetts – Suffolk – Boston

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

26569

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 26569
FDIC's unique number: 35269
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1016772
Report Date: 2002-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 2002-10-03

1908-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Massachusetts Co-operative Bank.
1986-02-21 Became FDIC insured.
1998-12-22 Changed organization type to Cooperative Bank Stock.
2002-09-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Abington Savings Bank in Abington, Massachusetts.
2004-04-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Compass Bank for Savings in New Bedford, Massachusetts.
2004-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sovereign Bank in Wyomissing, Pennsylvania.
2005-02-11 Acquired Waypoint Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2006-09-09 Acquired Independence Community Bank in Brooklyn, New York.
2011-06-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wyomissing, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $123,910,000
Total deposits: $100,984,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Massachusetts Co-operative Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Massachusetts Co-operative Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Massachusetts Co-operative Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-150

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.