MBank Westchase, National Association

Texas – Harris – Houston

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

20862

1972

FDIC Certificate Number: 20862
FDIC's unique number: 14411
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 203454
Report Date: 1987-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16039
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1972-11-16 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Woodlake, National Association.
1981-11-30 Changed name to Westchase National Bank .
1984-10-15 Changed name to Mbank Westchase, National Association .
1987-12-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of MBank Houston, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1988-06-10 Acquired Mbank Pasadena, National Association in Pasadena, Texas.
1989-03-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1989-07-12 Changed name to Bank One, Texas, National Association .
1990-02-02 Acquired Bright Banc Savings Association in Dallas, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
1990-03-22 Acquired American Bank Of Arlington in Arlington, Texas.
1990-03-30 Acquired Everman National Bank Of Fort Worth in Fort Worth, Texas.
1990-04-25 Acquired Trinity National Bank Of Dallas in Dallas, Texas.
1990-05-04 Acquired First State Fsa in San Antonio, Texas.
1990-08-02 Acquired United Bank Of Waco, National Association in Waco, Texas.
1990-09-06 Acquired Northside Bank in San Antonio, Texas.
1990-09-14 Acquired Capitol City Fsa in Austin, Texas.
1990-11-29 Acquired Bank Of Arlington in Arlington, Texas.
1991-05-16 Acquired Capital Bank in Dallas, Texas.
1991-07-19 Acquired First Federal Savings Association Of Conroe in Conroe, Texas.
1991-09-06 Acquired Benjamin Franklin Fsa in Houston, Texas.
1991-10-28 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1992-11-30 Acquired Team Bank in Fort Worth, Texas.
1993-04-09 Acquired United National Bank in Denton, Texas.
1994-03-07 Acquired Parkdale Bank in Beaumont, Texas.
1995-03-10 Acquired 1st*bank in Coppell, Texas.
2001-02-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2001-08-23 Acquired Bank One, Florida in Venice, Florida.
2001-11-09 Acquired Bank One, Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2001-11-09 Acquired Bank One, Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2002-06-21 Acquired Bank One, Michigan in Detroit, Michigan.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $110,346,000
Total deposits: $106,064,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

MBank Westchase, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with MBank Westchase, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and MBank Westchase, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-369

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.