Meramec State Bank

Missouri – Franklin – Sullivan

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21931

1975

FDIC Certificate Number: 21931
FDIC's unique number: 15199
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 297958
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-10-27

1975-02-24 Institution established. Original name: Meramec State Bank.
1994-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Sullivan in Sullivan, Missouri.
1997-06-30 Acquired American Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Sullivan in Sullivan, Missouri.

Total assets: $15,355,000
Total deposits: $13,278,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Meramec State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Meramec State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Meramec State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-198

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.