Metropolitan National Bank

Texas – Hidalgo – Mcallen

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

20863

1972

FDIC Certificate Number: 20863
FDIC's unique number: 14412
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 640853
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16040
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-31

1972-11-17 Institution established. Original name: Metropolitan National Bank.
1990-10-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Valley Bank in Harlingen, Texas.
1991-04-10 Changed name to First Valley Bank .
1991-04-10 Moved bank headquarters from Mcallen, Texas to Raymondville, Texas.
1995-06-01 Acquired Firstbank in Los Fresnos, Texas.
1996-01-01 Moved bank headquarters from Raymondville, Texas to Harlingen, Texas.
1996-05-15 Acquired Security State Bank in Pharr, Texas.
1999-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norwest Bank Texas, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1999-04-17 Acquired The First National Bank Of Franklin in Franklin, Texas.
1999-06-19 Acquired Mercantile Bank, National Association in Brownsville, Texas.
1999-06-19 Acquired First Bank Katy, National Association in Katy, Texas.
1999-09-18 Acquired First State Bank in Rio Vista, Texas.
2000-01-12 Acquired The Bank Of South Texas in Floresville, Texas.
2000-02-12 Acquired First National Bank Of South Texas in San Antonio, Texas.
2000-04-14 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank Texas, National Association .
2000-04-14 Acquired Norwest Bank El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
2000-04-14 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2000-06-24 Acquired Prime Bank in Houston, Texas.
2001-06-28 Acquired Midland Trust Company, National Association in Midland, Texas.
2002-06-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Texas in Decatur, Texas.
2002-06-15 Acquired First State Bank Of Texas in Denton, Texas.
2002-08-24 Acquired The First National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
2003-11-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2003-12-06 Acquired Bank Of Grand Junction in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-02-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Francisco, California to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Ohio, National Association in Van Wert, Ohio.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank New Mexico, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Illinois, National Association in Galesburg, Illinois.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank North Dakota, National Association in Fargo, North Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Michigan, National Association in Marquette, Michigan.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Indiana, National Association in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Wisconsin, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Nevada, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $19,851,000
Total deposits: $20,103,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Metropolitan National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Metropolitan National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Metropolitan National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-368

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.