Mid-Cal National Bank

California – San Joaquin – Lodi

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

19398

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19398
FDIC's unique number: 13203
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sacramento

Federal Reserve ID Number: 809164
Report Date: 1980-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15495
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1965-04-01 Institution established. Original name: Mid-cal National Bank.
1980-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Stockton in Stockton, California.
1989-10-02 Reorganized.
1990-05-11 Acquired Royal Oak Savings And Loan Association in Manteca, California.
2003-11-18 Acquired Modesto Commerce Bank in Modesto, California.

Total assets: $85,518,000
Total deposits: $79,775,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Mid-Cal National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Mid-Cal National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mid-Cal National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.