Mid-Hudson Savings Bank FSB

New York – Dutchess – Fishkill

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

16002

1857

FDIC Certificate Number: 16002
FDIC's unique number: 10232
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse

Federal Reserve ID Number: 956705
Report Date: 1994-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-29

1857-02-25 Institution established. Original name: Fishkill Savings Bank.
1973-07-01 Acquired Wappinger Savings Bank in Wappingers Falls, New York.
1973-07-01 Changed name to Mid-hudson Savings Bank .
1983-10-13 Changed name to Mid-hudson Savings Bank Fsb .
1989-12-20 Reorganized.
1992-10-01 Acquired Inter-county Savings Bank in New Paltz, New York.
1994-08-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association, New York in New York City, New York.
1994-10-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association in Salem, New Jersey.
1994-10-20 Changed name to First Fidelity Bank, National Association .
1994-10-20 Moved bank headquarters from Fishkill, New York to Newark, New Jersey.
1994-11-08 Moved bank headquarters from Newark, New Jersey to Elkton, Maryland.
1994-11-29 Acquired The Bank Of Baltimore in Baltimore, Maryland.
1994-12-30 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, Fsb in Beltsville, Maryland.
1996-01-01 Changed name to First Union National Bank .
1996-07-11 Moved bank headquarters from Elkton, Maryland to Avondale, Pennsylvania.
1998-01-16 Acquired Covenant Bank in Haddonfield, New Jersey.
1998-02-26 Moved bank headquarters from Avondale, Pennsylvania to Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-26 Acquired First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $504,797,000
Total deposits: $458,287,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Mid-Hudson Savings Bank FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Mid-Hudson Savings Bank FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Mid-Hudson Savings Bank FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-331

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.