Montgomery National Bank

West Virginia – Fayette – Montgomery

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6779

1901

FDIC Certificate Number: 6779
FDIC's unique number: 4556
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 953133
Report Date: 1992-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 5691
The date of the last data update: 1992-11-09

1901-01-19 Institution established. Original name: The Montgomery National Bank.
1986-10-14 Reorganized.
1986-10-14 Changed name to Montgomery National Bank .
1991-04-29 Acquired The National Bank Of Ansted in Ansted, West Virginia.
1992-10-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United National Bank in Parkersburg, West Virginia.
1993-01-01 Acquired United National Bank - Central in Glenville, West Virginia.
1993-01-01 Acquired United National Bank - North in Wheeling, West Virginia.
1993-09-01 Acquired First Bank Of Ceredo in Ceredo, West Virginia.
1993-09-10 Acquired Cb&t-westover; Bank, Inc. in Westover, West Virginia.
1996-01-27 Acquired United National Bank - South in Beckley, West Virginia.
1996-04-12 Acquired First Empire Federal Savings And Loan Association in Charleston, West Virginia.
1998-10-17 Acquired Fed One Bank in Wheeling, West Virginia.
2001-12-07 Acquired Century National Bank in Washington, District Of Columbia.
2002-03-23 Changed name to United Bank .
2002-03-23 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2002-03-23 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2002-04-04 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2002-04-04 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2007-07-14 Acquired Premier Bank, Inc. in Martinsburg, West Virginia.

Total assets: $89,149,000
Total deposits: $77,487,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Montgomery National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Montgomery National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Montgomery National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-271

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.