Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, Incorporated

Kentucky – Butler – Morgantown

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

275

1880

FDIC Certificate Number: 275
FDIC's unique number: 220
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hopkinsville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 330949
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1880-09-01 Institution established. Original name: Morgantown Deposit Bank, Incorporated.
1984-01-11 Changed name to Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, Incorporated .
1989-08-17 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.

Total assets: $133,723,000
Total deposits: $112,466,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $112,466,000
Equity capital: $12,840,000

Net income: $498,000

Return on Assets: 0.75
Return on Equity: 7.88
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: M.R. Melton Limited Partnership

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, Incorporated does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, Incorporated, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Morgantown Bank & Trust Company, Incorporated will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.