MSB Bank

New York – Orange – Middletown

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

16005

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 16005
FDIC's unique number: 10235
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 174004
Report Date: 1998-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-06-11

1869-09-06 Institution established. Original name: Middletown Savings Bank.
1992-06-26 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-10-27 Changed name to Msb Bank .
1995-10-27 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
1997-08-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1998-05-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the Hudson in Poughkeepsie, New York.
1999-03-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hudson United Bank in Union City, New Jersey.
1999-05-20 Acquired Little Falls Bank in Little Falls, New Jersey.
1999-08-10 Moved bank headquarters from Union City, New Jersey to Mahwah, New Jersey.
1999-12-01 Acquired The Farmers And Merchants National Bank Of Bridgeton in Bridgeton, New Jersey.
1999-12-01 Acquired Jefferson Bank in Haverford, Pennsylvania.
1999-12-01 Acquired Jefferson Bank Of New Jersey in Mount Laurel, New Jersey.
2002-06-28 Acquired Connecticut Bank Of Commerce in Stamford, Connecticut as part of a government assisted transaction.
2006-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of TD BankNorth, National Association in Portland, Maine.
2007-01-01 Acquired Interchange Bank in Saddle Brook, New Jersey.
2008-05-31 Changed name to Td Bank, National Association .
2008-05-31 Moved bank headquarters from Portland, Maine to Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
2008-05-31 Acquired Commerce Bank/north in Ramsey, New Jersey.
2010-04-16 Acquired Riverside National Bank Of Florida in Fort Pierce, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired First Federal Bank Of North Florida in Palatka, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-04-16 Acquired Americanfirst Bank in Clermont, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-09-30 Acquired Carolina First Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.

Total assets: $752,978,000
Total deposits: $670,918,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

MSB Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with MSB Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and MSB Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-338

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.