Muncie Federal Savings Bank

Indiana – Delaware – Muncie

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

27615

1889

FDIC Certificate Number: 27615
FDIC's unique number: 40449
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 863979
Report Date: 1992-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1993-02-04

1889-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Muncie Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1991-01-01 Changed name to Muncie Federal Savings Bank .
1991-01-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1993-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American National Bank and Trust Company of Muncie in Muncie, Indiana.
2000-08-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Old National Bank in Evansville, Indiana.
2000-10-12 Acquired First National Bank And Trust Company, Carbondale, Illinois in Carbondale, Illinois.
2000-10-12 Acquired Heritage Bank in Clarksville, Tennessee.
2001-03-08 Acquired Orange County Bank in Paoli, Indiana.
2007-02-02 Acquired St. Joseph Capital Bank in Mishawaka, Indiana.
2011-01-01 Acquired Monroe Bank in Bloomington, Indiana.
2011-07-29 Acquired Integra Bank National Association in Evansville, Indiana as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $121,703,000
Total deposits: $110,599,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Muncie Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Muncie Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Muncie Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-119

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.