Nebraska State Bank

Nebraska – Saline – Western

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16912

1945

FDIC Certificate Number: 16912
FDIC's unique number: 10997
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Omaha

Federal Reserve ID Number: 398752
Report Date: 1998-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-03-01

1945-07-30 Institution established. Original name: Nebraska State Bank.
1999-02-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of De Witt State Bank in De Witt, Nebraska.
2010-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First State Bank in Lincoln, Nebraska.

Total assets: $11,454,000
Total deposits: $9,187,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Nebraska State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Nebraska State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Nebraska State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-394

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.