North Cambridge Co-operative Bank

Massachusetts – Middlesex – Cambridge

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

26567

1912

FDIC Certificate Number: 26567
FDIC's unique number: 35267
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: North Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 931270
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1912-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: North Cambridge Co-operative Bank.
1986-02-05 Became FDIC insured.

Total assets: $89,019,000
Total deposits: $70,531,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $70,531,000
Equity capital: $17,952,000

Net income: $189,000

Return on Assets: 0.42
Return on Equity: 2.12
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

North Cambridge Co-operative Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with North Cambridge Co-operative Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Cambridge Co-operative Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-152

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.