North Texas Bank

Texas – Denton – Lewisville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21618

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21618
FDIC's unique number: 14952
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 881759
Report Date: 1988-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1974-06-06 Institution established. Original name: North Texas Bank.
1989-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Deposit Guaranty Bank in Dallas, Texas.
1989-06-30 Acquired First National Bank Of Richardson in Richardson, Texas.
1990-02-01 Changed name to Team Bank .
1990-02-01 Moved bank headquarters from Dallas, Texas to Fort Worth, Texas.
1990-02-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1990-02-01 Acquired Team Bank, National Association in Fort Worth, Texas.
1991-01-31 Acquired Bank Of The Hills in Austin, Texas.
1991-05-31 Acquired North Texas Federal Savings Association in Wichita Falls, Texas.
1991-06-13 Acquired Tascosa National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
1991-10-10 Acquired First National Bank in Fredericksburg, Texas.
1992-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1993-04-09 Acquired United National Bank in Denton, Texas.
1994-03-07 Acquired Parkdale Bank in Beaumont, Texas.
1995-03-10 Acquired 1st*bank in Coppell, Texas.
2001-02-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2001-08-23 Acquired Bank One, Florida in Venice, Florida.
2001-11-09 Acquired Bank One, Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2001-11-09 Acquired Bank One, Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2002-06-21 Acquired Bank One, Michigan in Detroit, Michigan.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $52,773,000
Total deposits: $48,413,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

North Texas Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with North Texas Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and North Texas Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-54

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.