Northwest Ohio Bank

Ohio – Wood – Bowling Green

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

394

1800

FDIC Certificate Number: 394
FDIC's unique number: 301
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 957113
Report Date: 1982-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-07

1800-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Cygnet Savings Bank Company.
1975-03-14 Changed name to Northwest Ohio Bank Of Wood County .
1978-01-16 Moved bank headquarters from Cygnet, Ohio to Bowling Green, Ohio.
1979-07-23 Changed name to Northwest Ohio Bank .
1982-05-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Toledo Trust Company in Toledo, Ohio.
1982-05-24 Moved bank headquarters from Bowling Green, Ohio to Toledo, Ohio.
1984-12-22 Acquired Maumee Valley National Bank in Defiance, Ohio.
1988-02-01 Changed name to Trustcorp Bank, Ohio .
1988-03-12 Acquired Trustcorp Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
1988-03-12 Acquired Trustcorp Company, Dayton in Dayton, Ohio.
1990-01-22 Changed name to Society Bank & Trust .
1993-08-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society National Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
1994-09-16 Acquired State Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Bowling Green, Ohio.
1996-06-17 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1996-06-17 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bryan, Ohio.
1997-06-23 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Naples, Florida.
1997-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $42,472,000
Total deposits: $36,430,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Northwest Ohio Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Northwest Ohio Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Northwest Ohio Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-168

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.