Oconomowoc Savings and Loan Association

Wisconsin – Waukesha – Oconomowoc

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30334

1922

FDIC Certificate Number: 30334
FDIC's unique number: 43168
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Milwaukee

Federal Reserve ID Number: 120775
Report Date: 1982-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-17

1922-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Oconomowoc Savings And Loan Association.
1982-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Security Savings and Loan Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1987-05-31 Acquired Colonial Savings Association in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
1987-12-31 Acquired Liberty Savings And Loan Association in West Allis, Wisconsin.
1990-05-14 Changed name to Security Bank S.S.B. .
1992-10-30 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1992-10-30 Changed name to Security Bank, S.S.B. .
1997-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of M&I; Marshall and Ilsley Bank in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2000-11-01 Acquired M & I Lakeview Bank in Sheboygan, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Burlington in Burlington, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; First National Bank in West Bend, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Racine in Racine, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Northern Bank in Brookfield, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Menomonee Falls in Menomonee Falls, Wisconsin.
2001-02-01 Acquired M&i; Lake Country Bank in Hartland, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Central State Bank in Oshkosh, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Shawano in Shawano, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Fox Valley in Appleton, Wisconsin.
2001-03-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Northeast in Green Bay, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Mid-state Bank in Stevens Point, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bank in Superior, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Ashland in Ashland, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; First American Bank in Wausau, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Citizens American Bank in Merrill, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Merchants Bank in Rhinelander, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Central Bank & Trust in Marshfield, Wisconsin.
2001-04-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Eagle River in Eagle River, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank South in Janesville, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank South Central in Watertown, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Mayville in Mayville, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of La Crosse in La Crosse, Wisconsin.
2001-05-01 Acquired M&i; Community State Bank in Eau Claire, Wisconsin.
2001-06-01 Acquired M&i; Bank Of Southern Wisconsin in Madison, Wisconsin.
2001-06-01 Acquired M&i; Thunderbird Bank in Phoenix, Arizona.
2001-11-01 Acquired National City Bank Of Minneapolis in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2002-06-01 Acquired Richfield Bank & Trust Co. in Richfield, Minnesota.
2002-06-01 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Eden Prairie, Minnesota.
2003-02-01 Acquired Southwest Bank Of Phoenix in Phoenix, Arizona.
2006-04-03 Acquired Gold Bank in Leawood, Kansas.
2007-06-27 Acquired United Heritage Bank in Orlando, Florida.
2007-08-01 Acquired Excel Bank Minnesota in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2008-02-02 Acquired First Indiana Bank, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2010-07-01 Acquired Southwest Bank, An M&i; Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2011-07-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BMO Harris Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Oconomowoc Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Oconomowoc Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Oconomowoc Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-240

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.