Omnibank Commerce City

Colorado – Adams – Commerce City

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

16913

1950

FDIC Certificate Number: 16913
FDIC's unique number: 10998
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 58654
Report Date: 1995-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1995-08-02

1950-06-03 Institution established. Original name: Metropolitan State Bank.
1993-02-01 Changed name to Omnibank Commerce City .
1995-07-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Colorado in Fort Collins, Colorado.
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $48,160,000
Total deposits: $33,962,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Omnibank Commerce City does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Omnibank Commerce City, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Omnibank Commerce City will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-395

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.