Palomar Community Bank

California – San Diego – Escondido

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

32226

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32226
FDIC's unique number: 45060
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Orange

Federal Reserve ID Number: 968678
Report Date: 2002-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-06-05

1984-06-19 Institution established. Original name: North County Savings And Loan Association.
1986-03-31 Changed name to Palomar Savings And Loan Association .
1999-11-04 Changed name to Palomar Community Bank .
1999-11-04 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1999-11-04 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2002-05-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Redlands Centennial Bank in Redlands, California.
2003-03-03 Changed name to 1st Centennial Bank .
2009-01-23 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First California Bank in Westlake Village, California.
2009-01-23 FDIC closing information for 1st Centennial Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/centennial.html.
2011-02-18 Acquired San Luis Trust Bank, Fsb in San Luis Obispo, California as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $90,899,000
Total deposits: $70,469,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Palomar Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Palomar Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Palomar Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-173

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.