Park Bank

Wisconsin – La Crosse – Holmen

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

13054

1909

FDIC Certificate Number: 13054
FDIC's unique number: 8251
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Madison

Federal Reserve ID Number: 518354
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1909-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Holmen.
1995-01-20 Changed name to Park Bank .

Total assets: $44,599,000
Total deposits: $36,990,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $36,990,000
Equity capital: $6,461,000

Net income: $247,000

Return on Assets: 1.13
Return on Equity: 7.81
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Park Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Park Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Park Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-81

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.