Partners Bank of Texas

Texas – Harris – Humble

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

57661

2003

FDIC Certificate Number: 57661
FDIC's unique number: 419254
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 3217117
Report Date: 2006-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-04-12

2003-11-20 Institution established. Original name: Partners Bank Of Texas.
2007-03-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sterling Bank in Houston, Texas.
2009-07-27 Moved bank headquarters from Humble, Texas to Houston, Texas.
2011-07-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Comerica Bank in Dallas, Texas.

Total assets: $185,935,000
Total deposits: $162,531,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Partners Bank of Texas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Partners Bank of Texas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Partners Bank of Texas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-191

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.