Peninsula Bank

Florida – Sarasota – Englewood

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26563

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26563
FDIC's unique number: 35262
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tampa

Federal Reserve ID Number: 61533
Report Date: 2010-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-26

1986-01-21 Institution established. Original name: 1st American Bank Of Charlotte County.
1991-11-13 Changed name to Peninsula State Bank .
1998-01-01 Changed name to Peninsula Bank .
2010-06-25 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Premier American Bank, National Association in Miami, Florida.
2010-06-25 FDIC closing information for Peninsula Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/peninsulafl.html.
2011-04-29 Acquired First National Bank Of Central Florida in Winter Park, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-04-29 Acquired Cortez Community Bank in Brooksville, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-05-06 Acquired Coastal Bank in Cocoa Beach, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-15 Acquired First Peoples Bank in Port Saint Lucie, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-25 Changed name to Florida Community Bank, National Association .

Total assets: $630,179,000
Total deposits: $580,140,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Peninsula Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Peninsula Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Peninsula Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-156

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.