People's Bank and Trust

Mississippi – DeSoto – Olive Branch

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20864

1972

FDIC Certificate Number: 20864
FDIC's unique number: 14413
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 589345
Report Date: 1981-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1972-05-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: People's Bank And Trust.
1972-11-17 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1972-11-17 Became FDIC insured.
1972-11-17 FDIC certificate number changed to .
1981-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Mantee in Mantee, Mississippi.
1987-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Olive Branch, Mississippi to Mantee, Mississippi.
1987-07-01 Changed name to Omnibank Of Mantee .
1989-07-03 Acquired First United Bank in Bay Springs, Mississippi.
1989-07-17 Changed name to Omnibank, Mantee, Mississippi .
1992-12-03 Changed name to Omnibank .

Total assets: $14,686,000
Total deposits: $13,201,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

People's Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with People's Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and People's Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-365

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.