Pilgrim Bank Texas

Texas – Donley – Clarendon

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

17117

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 17117
FDIC's unique number: 11160
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock

Federal Reserve ID Number: 207564
Report Date: 2009-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-17

1910-01-01 Institution established. Original name: City State Bank In Wellington.
1990-01-01 Acquired Security State Bank in Hedley, Texas.
1990-01-01 Changed name to Community Bank .
2008-02-01 Changed name to Pilgrim Bank Texas .
2008-06-16 Moved bank headquarters from Wellington, Texas to Clarendon, Texas.
2009-11-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pilgrim Bank in Pittsburg, Texas.

Total assets: $17,592,000
Total deposits: $14,514,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Pilgrim Bank Texas does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Pilgrim Bank Texas, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pilgrim Bank Texas will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25289

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.