Pioneer Citizens Bank of Nevada

Nevada – Washoe – Reno

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19394

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19394
FDIC's unique number: 13199
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix

Federal Reserve ID Number: 659163
Report Date: 1999-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-12-15

1965-03-31 Institution established. Original name: Pioneer Citizens Bank Of Nevada.
1999-10-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Nevada State Bank in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2000-10-26 Moved bank headquarters from Reno, Nevada to Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-09-05 Acquired Silver State Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-17 Acquired Great Basin Bank Of Nevada in Elko, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $1,122,160,000
Total deposits: $942,371,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Pioneer Citizens Bank of Nevada does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Pioneer Citizens Bank of Nevada, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Pioneer Citizens Bank of Nevada will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-62

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.