Provident Bank

New York – Rockland – Suffern

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

30337

1895

FDIC Certificate Number: 30337
FDIC's unique number: 43171
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 125471
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 705E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 39
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1895-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Provident Savings, A Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1990-05-12 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Suffern in Suffern, New York.
1991-01-23 Changed name to Provident Savings Bank, F.A. .
1997-01-22 Changed name to Provident Bank .
1998-09-24 Moved bank headquarters from Haverstraw, New York to Montebello, New York.
1999-01-07 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
2000-02-18 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2002-04-24 Acquired The National Bank Of Florida in Florida, New York.
2004-01-14 Acquired Ellenville National Bank in Ellenville, New York.
2004-10-01 Acquired The Warwick Savings Bank in Warwick, New York.
2004-10-01 Acquired The Towne Center Bank in Lodi, New Jersey.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $2,967,471,000
Total deposits: $2,131,304,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,131,304,000
Equity capital: $405,223,000

Net income: $5,222,000

Return on Assets: 0.36
Return on Equity: 2.61
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Provident Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Provident Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Provident Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-243

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.