Republic Bank California National Association

California – Los Angeles – Beverly Hills

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

25123

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 25123
FDIC's unique number: 17383
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 172569
Report Date: 2000-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22663
The date of the last data update: 2001-01-10

1984-05-04 Institution established. Original name: Safrabank.
1993-04-14 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to Encino, California.
1993-09-20 Changed name to Republic Bank California National Association .
1993-09-20 Moved bank headquarters from Encino, California to Beverly Hills, California.
1993-09-20 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2000-10-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of HSBC Bank USA in Buffalo, New York.
2004-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of HSBC Bank USA, National Association in New Castle, Delaware.
2004-08-25 Moved bank headquarters from Buffalo, New York to Wilmington, Delaware.
2005-03-01 Acquired Bank Of Bermuda Limited in New York City, New York.
2008-12-20 Moved bank headquarters from Wilmington, Delaware to Mc Lean, Virginia.
2008-12-20 Acquired Hsbc National Bank Usa in Bethesda, Maryland.

Total assets: $682,738,000
Total deposits: $605,790,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Republic Bank California National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Republic Bank California National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Republic Bank California National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25997

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.