Royal Bank-West Side National Association

Missouri – St. Louis – Saint Louis

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

19395

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19395
FDIC's unique number: 13200
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 443456
Report Date: 1987-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15494
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1965-03-22 Institution established. Original name: West Side National Bank.
1982-06-01 Changed name to Royal Bank-west Side National Association .
1987-10-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Royal Bank Mid-County in University City, Missouri.
1987-12-04 Changed name to Royal Banks Of Missouri .

Total assets: $35,068,000
Total deposits: $31,892,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Royal Bank-West Side National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Royal Bank-West Side National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Royal Bank-West Side National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-61

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.