Santander National Bank

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

31162

1960

FDIC Certificate Number: 31162
FDIC's unique number: 43996
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: San Juan

Federal Reserve ID Number: 822172
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 22229
The date of the last data update: 1995-01-31

1960-03-30 Institution established. Original name: Bayamon Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Puerto Rico.
1987-04-30 Changed name to The Federal Savings Bank Of Puerto Rico .
1987-04-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1992-02-01 Changed name to Santander National Bank .
1992-02-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1992-02-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1994-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Banco Santander Puerto Rico in San Juan, Puerto Rico.
1996-10-12 Acquired Banco Central Hispano - Puerto Rico in San Juan, Puerto Rico.
2007-12-31 Reorganized.

Total assets: $1,081,813,000
Total deposits: $788,822,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Santander National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Santander National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Santander National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-195

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.