SCB Bank

Indiana – Shelby – Shelbyville

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

29761

1891

FDIC Certificate Number: 29761
FDIC's unique number: 42595
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 353975
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 704E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1891-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Shelbyville.
1988-12-31 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.
1991-12-31 Changed name to Shelby County Savings Bank, Fsb .
1991-12-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1998-06-26 Changed name to Shelby County Bank .
2007-07-20 Changed name to Scb Bank .
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $226,911,000
Total deposits: $206,826,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $206,826,000
Equity capital: $7,574,000

Net income: $-1,756,000

Return on Assets: -1.49
Return on Equity: -40.88
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

SCB Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with SCB Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and SCB Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-99

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.