Sentry Savings and Loan Association

Connecticut – Fairfield – Stamford

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32227

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32227
FDIC's unique number: 45061
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hartford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 967073
Report Date: 1993-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1994-02-25

1984-06-21 Institution established. Original name: Sentry Savings And Loan Association.
1993-12-31 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Total assets: $13,127,000
Total deposits: $12,324,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sentry Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sentry Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sentry Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-174

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.