Sky Bank

Ohio – Columbiana – Salineville

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

5982

1887

FDIC Certificate Number: 5982
FDIC's unique number: 4057
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 576710
Report Date: 2007-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2007-09-28

1887-11-06 Institution established. Original name: The Ohio Bank And Savings Company.
1990-04-01 Changed name to The Ohio Bank .
1991-03-01 Acquired Citizens Community Bank in Mount Blanchard, Ohio.
1998-12-05 Acquired American Community Bank, National Association in Lima, Ohio.
1998-12-05 Acquired Amerifirst Bank, National Association in Xenia, Ohio.
2001-02-20 Changed name to Sky Bank-ohio Bank Region .
2001-12-31 Acquired Sky Bank in Salineville, Ohio.
2001-12-31 Changed name to Sky Bank .
2001-12-31 Acquired Sky Bank-mid Am Region in Toledo, Ohio.
2001-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from Findlay, Ohio to Salineville, Ohio.
2002-10-26 Acquired Three Rivers Bank And Trust Company in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2003-05-16 Acquired Metropolitan Bank And Trust in Highland Hills, Ohio.
2003-12-13 Acquired Great Lakes Bank in Mentor, Ohio.
2004-07-02 Acquired The Second National Bank Of Warren in Warren, Ohio.
2004-12-03 Acquired Prospect Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
2005-06-03 Acquired Belmont National Bank in Wheeling, West Virginia.
2005-12-03 Acquired Falls Bank in Stow, Ohio.
2006-11-03 Acquired Union Federal Bank Of Indianapolis in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2006-12-09 Acquired Perpetual State Bank in Wellsville, Ohio.
2007-09-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Huntington National Bank in Columbus, Ohio.
2009-10-02 Acquired Warren Bank in Warren, Michigan as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $16,609,763,000
Total deposits: $12,937,515,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sky Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sky Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sky Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.