Southern Deposit Bank

Kentucky – Logan – Russellville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

271

1916

FDIC Certificate Number: 271
FDIC's unique number: 217
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hopkinsville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 178347
Report Date: 2000-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-12-08

1916-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Southern Deposit Bank.
2000-10-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Area Bank in Owensboro, Kentucky.
2002-07-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Branch Banking and Trust Company in Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2002-09-13 Acquired Bank Of Louisville in Louisville, Kentucky.
2002-11-08 Acquired First South Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2003-03-14 Acquired Equitable Bank in Wheaton, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Farmers Bank Of Maryland in Annapolis, Maryland.
2003-10-11 Acquired Atlantic Bank in Ocean City, Maryland.
2004-06-11 Acquired Republic Bank in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
2006-09-16 Acquired Main Street Bank in Covington, Georgia.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank in Ducktown, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Bank/first Citizens Bank in Cleveland, Tennessee.
2006-11-11 Acquired The Home Bank Of Tennessee in Maryville, Tennessee.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
2006-12-31 Acquired Branch Banking And Trust Company Of Virginia in Richmond, Virginia.
2007-08-18 Acquired Coastal Federal Bank in Myrtle Beach, South Carolina.
2008-12-12 Acquired Haven Trust Bank in Duluth, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-14 Acquired Colonial Bank in Montgomery, Alabama as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $81,709,000
Total deposits: $61,782,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Southern Deposit Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Southern Deposit Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southern Deposit Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.