Standard Federal Savings Bank

South Carolina – Richland – Columbia

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

27618

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 27618
FDIC's unique number: 40452
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Sc

Federal Reserve ID Number: 802277
Report Date: 1991-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1991-11-21

1908-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Standard Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1989-03-31 Changed name to Standard Federal Savings Bank .
1989-03-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-08-02 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Standard Federal Savings and Loan Association in Columbia, South Carolina.
1993-09-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The National Bank of South Carolina in Sumter, South Carolina.
1994-12-19 Moved bank headquarters from Columbia, South Carolina to Sumter, South Carolina.
2001-02-16 Acquired Carolina Southern Bank in Spartanburg, South Carolina.
2010-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Synovus Bank in Columbus, Georgia.
2010-06-30 Acquired The Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired Trust One Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.

Total assets: $319,651,000
Total deposits: $280,738,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Standard Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Standard Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Standard Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-116

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.