State Bank of Pennock

Minnesota – Kandiyohi – Pennock

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

9754

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 9754
FDIC's unique number: 6241
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Mankato

Federal Reserve ID Number: 728555
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Pennock.
1989-10-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Heritage Bank National Association in Willmar, Minnesota.
1996-10-07 Moved bank headquarters from Pennock, Minnesota to Willmar, Minnesota.
2003-03-24 Moved bank headquarters from Willmar, Minnesota to Spicer, Minnesota.
2004-10-09 Acquired Farmers' State Bank Of Raymond in Raymond, Minnesota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Heritage Bank, National Association in Holstein, Iowa.

Total assets: $9,841,000
Total deposits: $8,901,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

State Bank of Pennock does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with State Bank of Pennock, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank of Pennock will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-227

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.