State Bank & Trust Company

Texas – Bee – Beeville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

10701

1931

FDIC Certificate Number: 10701
FDIC's unique number: 6866
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 212456
Report Date: 2006-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-04-10

1931-12-12 Institution established. Original name: State Bank & Trust Company.
2007-03-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of International Bank of Commerce in Zapata, Texas.

Total assets: $75,309,000
Total deposits: $68,538,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

State Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with State Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-50

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.