Superior National Bank & Trust Company

Michigan – Houghton – Hancock

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

5058

1890

FDIC Certificate Number: 5058
FDIC's unique number: 3377
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 245557
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9087

Number of Domestic Offices: 10
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-03-03

1890-03-06 Institution established. Original name: The Superior National Bank And Trust Company Of Hancock.
1990-06-30 Reorganized.
1990-06-30 Changed name to Superior National Bank & Trust Company .
2009-01-01 Acquired Commercial National Bank Of L'anse in L'anse, Michigan.

Total assets: $486,251,000
Total deposits: $418,786,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $418,786,000
Equity capital: $54,520,000

Net income: $2,589,000

Return on Assets: 1.09
Return on Equity: 9.97
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Keweenaw Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Superior National Bank & Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Superior National Bank & Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Superior National Bank & Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-280

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.