Tanners National Bank in Woburn

Massachusetts – Middlesex – Woburn

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

13981

1934

FDIC Certificate Number: 13981
FDIC's unique number: 8744
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: North Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 716105
Report Date: 1983-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14033
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Tanners National Bank In Woburn.
1983-04-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Arlington Five Cents Savings Bank in Arlington, Massachusetts.
1984-08-17 Changed name to Bank Five For Savings .
1991-09-20 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Cambridge Savings Bank in Cambridge, Massachusetts.
1992-12-30 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
1998-09-16 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1998-09-16 Reorganized.
2002-07-17 Changed trust powers from Limited Trust Powers Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.

Total assets: $21,296,000
Total deposits: $19,733,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Tanners National Bank in Woburn does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Tanners National Bank in Woburn, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Tanners National Bank in Woburn will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-321

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.